## Watch The 19 Demo Mental Math Videos Tutorials

These mental math video tutorials here are part of the FREE 100 videos in the Local Website and Video Bundle package when the Mental Math Unleash The Power eBook is purchased. As demo videos on this web page, the 19 videos are not full videos but they contain samples from some of the 14 subjects in the eBook. The full videos for each contain more instructions and examples. The same 19 demo videos are also listed on the Mental Math Power YouTube channel. The full video bundle contains techniques from all 14 math subjects in the Mental Math Unleash The Power eBook – the videos do not represent every technique in the eBook. Furthermore, these 19 videos or the full video bundle do not consist of every techniques from the Mental Math Unleash The Power – Bonus Package eBook.

This is a very specific technique for multiplying two-digit numbers to each other – these numbers have values close to and under 100.

(98 X 95) or (99 X 85) or (92 X 96), etc.

The technique, based on two parts, is more efficient and manageable for multiplying these types of two-digit numbers to each other than other methods. Solving the answers involving these types of numbers with this technique is easy.

This is another specific technique for multiplying two-digit numbers to each other – these numbers have values close to and over 100. The technique is not recommended if the numbers are too far from 100 such as 124, 134, or beyond.

(102 X 107) or (112 X 106) or (108 X 104), etc.

The numbers in each set above are close and over 100. For these types of numbers, this technique is preferred over others for performing the same task.

This mental math technique is specifically designed for multiplying two numbers that end in a 5 each – meaning they both end in 5 and have the same value. Other closely related techniques are also available in the Mental Math Unleash The Power eBook.

(25 X 25) or (35 X 35) or (115 X 115), etc.

It is easy to learn and apply. Here are two conditions that need to be met for this technique to be applicable.

(i) Both numbers have the same value.

(ii) Both numbers end in a 5.

(i) Both numbers have the same value.

(ii) Both numbers end in a 5.

This is a great mental math technique for multiplying any whole numbers by 5 in your head. Once you become are proficient enough, the technique can be expanded to multiplying decimal numbers as well. Therefore, it is not limited to only to certain types of numbers but a whole range of them.

However, answers can be solved even faster if the numbers meet certain requirements such as in the following numbers.

(324 X 5) or (46.14 X 5) or (802246 X 5)

The mental math technique here is used for dividing numbers by 5 quickly. It can also be used for dividing decimal numbers by 5 but being proficient in dividing whole numbers by 5 first is important. This technique uses a multiplication process instead of division when dividing by 5.

(124 ÷ 5) or (781 ÷ 5) or (67248 ÷ 5)

Math division is considered by most to be one of the hardest fundamental math courses – this makes it easier.

As stated before, many mental math techniques are available for solving math problems and typically there is more than one technique that can perform the same task. Here is an extremely effective division technique for dividing a number by another very efficient and manageable under the right conditions.

(246 ÷ 2) or (1201 ÷ 5) or (511734 ÷ 17)

When the right situations exist, the answers can be solved within in seconds – even faster than using pen/pencil and paper.

This is one of those techniques designed specifically for dividing for when the divisor and dividend share a special relationship. The relation is based on parts of the dividend where one part is evenly divisible by the divisor. A compensation step is required but it is relatively easy to perform.

The technique consists of simple math addition and multiplication procedures versus the standard approach, which involves multiplying an identical two-digit number together and then completing the arithmetic. Squaring a two-digit number such as 32 means to multiply 32 by 32.

So how would you square numbers with only 1s? Multiplication is not even necessary using this technique.

For example, to find the square root of 1.4641 is to determine a decimal number when multiplied to itself gives 1.4641 (rounded). So this means the decimal number that was multiplied to itself is the square root of 1.4641 because it requires multiplying the decimal number to itself in producing 1.4641.

Can you find the cube root for a number such as 12167 in your head quickly? Watch this video if you do. The mental math cube root technique here is for determining the cube roots of five-digit perfect cube numbers (others are also available in the eBook).

21 cubed = 21 X 21 X 21

Perfect cube numbers are created from multiplying three of the same whole numbers to each other. With proficiency in this technique, the answers can be found without the use of pen/pencil and paper.

Generally, when adding two fractions to each other the lowest common denominator (LCD) is required before other arithmetic processes can be used in finding the answer. Using the technique here does not require the LCD.

This technique is very efficient and easy to learn but most of all it is manageable even when performed mentally. General mental math techniques for adding two fractions together are also available in the Mental Math Unleash The Power eBook. This is a unique technique designed for the specific purpose mentioned.

The eBook also has several techniques for dividing between different

types of fractions (proper/improper/mixed).